IN SB0256 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the legislative council to assign as a study topic during the legislative interim of the issue of whether a student or the parent of a student who believes the student has been improperly denied participation in an educational function or subjected to an illegal rule or standard should be entitled to a hearing with the school corporation's superintendent, upon request of the student or parent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School corporation administrative hearings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-08 First reading: referred to Committee on Education
2010-02-02 Cosponsor: Rep. Behning
2010-02-02 House sponsor: Rep. Porter
2010-02-02 Referred to the House
2010-02-02 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 131: Yeas 41 and Nays 9
2010-02-01 Senator Randolph added as coauthor
2010-02-01 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-28 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-26 Senator Rogers added as second author
2010-01-11 First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2010-01-11 Authored by Senator Kruse

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback