IN SB0255 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 96
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 96
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Underground petroleum storage tanks. Provides for the underground petroleum storage tank excess liability trust fund to be referred to as the "ELTF". Eliminates a provision stating that fees and penalties paid in connection with underground petroleum storage tanks are a source of funds for the ELTF. (Under IC 13-23-6-2 and IC 13-23-12-4, those fees and penalties are deposited in the underground petroleum storage tank trust fund, not in the ELTF.) Repeals IC 13-23-7-9, a provision under which knowingly or intentionally making a material misstatement in connection with an application for financial assistance from the ELTF is a Level 6 felony.
Title
Underground petroleum storage tanks. Provides for the underground petroleum storage tank excess liability trust fund to be referred to as the "ELTF". Eliminates a provision stating that fees and penalties paid in connection with underground petroleum storage tanks are a source of funds for the ELTF. (Under IC 13-23-6-2 and IC 13-23-12-4, those fees and penalties are deposited in the underground petroleum storage tank trust fund, not in the ELTF.) Repeals IC 13-23-7-9, a provision under which knowingly or intentionally making a material misstatement in connection with an application for financial assistance from the ELTF is a Level 6 felony.
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Howard Kenley [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. David Wolkins [R] | Rep. Greg Beumer [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Public Law 96 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 346: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-03-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 344: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2016-03-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Beumer |
2016-02-02 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Wolkins |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 140: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as second author |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |