IN SB0252 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Death penalty. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate interim study committee the topics of: (1) death sentences; (2) life imprisonment without the possibility of parole; and (3) circumstances justifying the imposition of: (A) a death sentence; or (B) life imprisonment without the possibility of parole.
Title
Death penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as second author |
2021-02-09 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Shackleford |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 87: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |