IN SB0252 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Public Law 256
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Horse racing matters. Requires the Indiana horse racing commission (IHRC) to promote the horse racing industry in Indiana, including its simulcast product. Provides that promotional costs may be paid from the breed development funds. Increases the amount of money in the breed development funds that may be used for IHRC expenses from 2% to 4%. Provides that not more than 50% of that amount may be used to pay costs incurred to promote the Indiana horse racing industry. Requires the IHRC to annually report and account for its promotional actions and expenditures. Specifies that the number of days that the

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Horse racing matters. Requires the Indiana horse racing commission (IHRC) to promote the horse racing industry in Indiana, including its simulcast product. Provides that promotional costs may be paid from the breed development funds. Increases the amount of money in the breed development funds that may be used for IHRC expenses from 2% to 4%. Provides that not more than 50% of that amount may be used to pay costs incurred to promote the Indiana horse racing industry. Requires the IHRC to annually report and account for its promotional actions and expenditures. Specifies that the number of days that the

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12SenatePublic Law 256
2015-05-12SenateBill Became Law on 8th Day Without Signature
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 533: yeas 39, nays 10
2015-04-28HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 565: yeas 91, nays 6
2015-04-22HouseRepresentative Cherry added as advisor
2015-04-21HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Dermody, Thompson, Austin and GiaQuinta
2015-04-21HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Eberhart and Goodin
2015-04-20SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Leising, Arnold J and Alting
2015-04-20SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Kenley and Lanane
2015-04-20SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2015-04-20SenateMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-16HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-04-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 449: yeas 92, nays 4
2015-04-02HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-19HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2015-02-06SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-03SenateSenator Leising added as coauthor
2015-02-03SenateRepresentative Goodin added as cosponsor
2015-02-03SenateRepresentative Eberhart added as sponsor
2015-02-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 77: yeas 47, nays 3
2015-02-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-29SenateSenator Arnold added as coauthor
2015-01-29SenateSenator Lanane added as second author
2015-01-29SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-08SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2015-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Kenley.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/252/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/8/7/208791c6/SB0252.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/e/1/5fe1c2cb/SB0252.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/0/9/a009bea8/SB0252.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/e/f/f0efb510/SB0252.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/d/4/4bd45d5c/SB0252.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/3/f/203ff7a7/SB0252.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/4/b/1d4b2f7f/SB0252.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/5/e/005e6e6b/SB0252.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/6/c/e36cc92b/SB0252.77.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/5/9/61591ba6/SB0252.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/a/e/eeae72c1/SB0252.449.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/a/9/25a92b8a/SB0252.565.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/7/5/1b75e2f5/SB0252.533.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback