IN SB0251 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Public Law 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Public Law 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Deduction of dues to exclusive representative. Provides that a school employee has the right to resign from, and end any financial obligation to, a school employee organization at any time. Provides that a school employee must annually authorize a pay deduction to a school employee organization. Provides that the attorney general, in consultation with the Indiana education employment relations board (board) shall prescribe an authorization for withholding form for use by a school employee to deduct dues from the pay of the school employee to the school employee organization. Adds certain requirements for information to be included on the form. Provides that after receiving the authorization for withholding form, the employer shall confirm the authorization by sending an electronic mail message to the school employee at the employee's school provided work electronic mail address and shall wait for confirmation of the authorization before starting any deduction. Specifies the time frame for (1) ceasing withholding upon receipt of a request, and (2) providing notice to the school employee organization. Provides that a school employer shall annually provide, at a time it prescribes, written or electronic mail notification to its school employees of their right to cease payment of school employee organization dues and to withdraw from that organization. Specifies what the notification must include. Provides that the attorney general, in consultation with the board and the department of education, must annually provide notice to school employers of certain provisions.
Title
Deduction of dues to exclusive representative.
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] |
Rep. Chuck Goodrich [R] | Rep. Robert Behning [R] | Rep. John Prescott [R] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Hatfield) failed (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Reread third time (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 24 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Hatfield) failed (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Reread third time (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 24 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Public Law 98 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-07 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2021-04-06 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 366: yeas 58, nays 34 |
2021-04-05 | House | Amendment #1 (Hatfield) failed; Roll Call 357: yeas 31, nays 62 |
2021-04-05 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-04-01 | House | Representative Carbaugh added as cosponsor |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | Representative Prescott added as cosponsor |
2021-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Behning |
2021-02-18 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Goodrich |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reread third time: passed; Roll Call 137: yeas 27, nays 22 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as coauthor |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second author |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Third reading: failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 131: yeas 24, nays 22 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as third author |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |