IN SB0251 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 136
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 136
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Indiana out of school time learning advisory board. Establishes the out of school time learning advisory board for a three year period. Provides for ex officio members and members appointed by the secretary of the family and social services administration and the state superintendent of public instruction. Provides that the advisory board considers and reports on existing out of school time programs and recommends to the department and general assembly policies, procedures, funding levels, and eligibility criteria. Requires the advisory board to make an initial report to the general assembly before November 1, 2016.
Title
Indiana out of school time learning advisory board. Establishes the out of school time learning advisory board for a three year period. Provides for ex officio members and members appointed by the secretary of the family and social services administration and the state superintendent of public instruction. Provides that the advisory board considers and reports on existing out of school time programs and recommends to the department and general assembly policies, procedures, funding levels, and eligibility criteria. Requires the advisory board to make an initial report to the general assembly before November 1, 2016.
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Rep. Robert Behning [R] | Rep. Vernon Smith [D] |
Rep. Charles Burton [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Public Law 136 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 230: yeas 41, nays 4 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2016-02-23 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 206: yeas 90, nays 4 |
2016-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2016-02-03 | House | Representative Rhoads removed as cosponsor |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Rhoads, Smith, V., Burton |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senator Yoder removed as third author |
2016-01-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Behning |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 58: yeas 31, nays 18 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Schneider) failed; voice vote |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as third author |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as second author |
2016-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kruse |