IN SB0249 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
Pending: Senate Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Net metering for electricity generation. Amends the statute concerning distributed electricity generation as follows: (1) Provides that an electricity supplier's net metering tariff must be made and remain available to customers until the earlier of: (A) January 1 of the first calendar year after the calendar year in which the aggregate amount of net metering facility nameplate capacity under the electricity supplier's net metering tariff equals at least 5% (versus 1.5% under current law) of the electricity supplier's most recent summer peak load; or (B) July 1, 2024 (versus July 1, 2022, under current law). (2) Provides that before July 1, 2021, each electricity supplier shall petition the utility regulatory commission (IURC) for approval of an amended or a new net metering tariff to do the following: (A) Establish as the allowed limit on the aggregate amount of net metering facility nameplate capacity under the net metering tariff an amount equal to at least 5% (versus 1.5% under current law) of the most recent summer peak load of the electricity supplier. (B) Establish a required reservation of capacity under the nameplate capacity limit to require the reservation of: (i) 30% (versus 40% under current law) of the capacity for participation by residential customers; and (ii) 5% (versus 15% under current law) of the capacity for participation by customers that install a net metering facility that uses organic waste biomass. (3) Makes conforming amendments. Adds a noncode provision staying the implementation of a rate for the procurement of excess distributed generation for which an electricity supplier has applied or received approval from the IURC under current law, until such time as the conditions for the expiration of the electricity supplier's net metering tariff, as set forth in the bill, apply to the electricity supplier.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Net metering for electricity generation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
2021-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Alting

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback