IN SB0249 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 47
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that various local retirement plans must report annually to the state board of accounts. Specifies information to be included in a retirement plan report. Requires the state examiner to submit a report annually to the general assembly that summarizes the information received by the state board of accounts concerning various local retirement plans. Repeals the chapter providing that the Indiana public retirement system (INPRS) receive reports from various state and local retirement plans. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the pension management oversight commission.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pension plan reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 47
2013-04-12SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-01SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-03-25HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2013-03-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 326: yeas 94, nays 0
2013-03-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-19HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2013-01-24SenateSenator Skinner added as second author
2013-01-24SenateCosponsor: Rep. Niezgodski
2013-01-24SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Wesco
2013-01-24SenateReferred to the House
2013-01-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 22: yeas 47 and nays 0
2013-01-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-01-17SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2013-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Walker

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback