IN SB0249 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that a clerk of a circuit court: (1) may forward a record of marriage to the state department of health in a paper form or in an electronic form by using an automated system developed by the judicial technology and automation project or another automated system approved by the state department of health; and (2) who forwards a record of marriage to the state department of health in an electronic form is not required to forward the record of marriage to the state department of health in a paper form.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Record of marriage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-23 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-06 Signed by the Governor
2012-02-29 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-02-28 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-02-28 Signed by the Speaker
2012-02-23 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2012-02-23 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 228: yeas 93, nays 0
2012-02-21 Amendment 3 (Thompson), withdrawn
2012-02-21 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-14 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-01-31 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2012-01-24 Cosponsor: Rep. Klinker
2012-01-24 House sponsor: Rep. Truitt
2012-01-24 Referred to the House
2012-01-24 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 69: yeas 50 and nays 0
2012-01-23 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-19 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-01-04 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2012-01-04 Authored by Senator Alting

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback