IN SB0248 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Senator Walker K added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Senator Walker K added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Driving privilege cards. Provides that an individual who is an Indiana resident and cannot provide proof of identity and lawful status in the United States may apply for a driving privilege card to obtain driving privileges. Sets forth the requirements to obtain a driving privilege card. Provides that a driving privilege card may not be used as identification for any state or federal purpose other than to confer driving privileges, for the purpose of voting, or to verify employment. Requires an individual who holds a driving privilege card and operates a motor vehicle to verify and continuously maintain financial responsibility on any motor vehicle operated by the individual who holds the driving privilege card in the amount required by law. Provides that the bureau of motor vehicles may not disclose certain information unless presented with a lawful court order or judicial warrant. Requires an applicant for a driving privilege card or driving privilege card renewal to sign up for selective service. Makes conforming amendments. Makes technical corrections.
Title
Driving privilege cards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senator Walker K added as coauthor |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as coauthor |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senators Bohacek and Walker G added as coauthors |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senator Qaddoura added as coauthor |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senator Donato added as coauthor |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senators Bassler and Alting added as coauthors |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as coauthor |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as third author |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as second author |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Doriot |
Subjects
CRIMES AND OFFENSES generally
ELECTIONS generally
IDENTITY
MOTOR VEHICLES, Bureau of Motor Vehicles, License Branches
MOTOR VEHICLES, Drivers' Licenses
ELECTIONS generally
IDENTITY
MOTOR VEHICLES, Bureau of Motor Vehicles, License Branches
MOTOR VEHICLES, Drivers' Licenses