IN SB0248 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 242
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

State employee deferred compensation contributions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State employee deferred compensation contributions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Reread third time: passed (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 242
2013-05-11SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-05-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-26HouseConference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 655: yeas 92, nays 7
2013-04-26HouseRules suspended
2013-04-26SenateConference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 543: yeas 48, nays 2
2013-04-18HouseHouse advisors appointed: Gutwein, Leonard and Moseley
2013-04-18HouseHouse conferees appointed: Steuerwald and Niezgodski
2013-04-17SenateSenate advisors appointed: Schneider, Skinner and Boots
2013-04-17SenateSenate conferee appointed: Walker and Tallian
2013-04-17SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2013-03-26HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-03-26HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 346: yeas 79, nays 19
2013-03-25HouseAmendment 1 (Burton), prevailed; voice vote
2013-03-25HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-03-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2013-01-31SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2013-01-31SenateCosponsor: Rep. Niezgodski
2013-01-31SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Steuerwald
2013-01-31SenateReferred to the House
2013-01-31SenateReread third time: passed; Roll Call 51: yeas 37, nays 12
2013-01-29SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2013-01-29SenateThird reading: call withdrawn
2013-01-28SenateSenator Schneider added as second author
2013-01-28SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-01-24SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2013-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Walker

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback