IN SB0248 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the legislative council to assign to an interim study committee during the 2012 legislative interim the topics of: (1) the use of balanced school calendars by school corporations; and (2) procedures for the implementation or discontinuance of the use of balanced calendars, including the use of referenda.
Title
Balanced school calendar.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-31 | Cosponsor: Rep. Thompson | |
2012-01-31 | House sponsor: Rep. Rhoads | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 132: yeas 36 and nays 13 | |
2012-01-26 | Senator Landske added as second author | |
2012-01-26 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | Senator Broden added as coauthor | |
2012-01-23 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Leising |