IN SB0247 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 163
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creditors' rights. Makes various changes to probate and trust law relating to creditors' claims, claims against nonprobate transferees, and no contest provisions in wills and trusts. Defines "no contest provision". Provides that a no contest provision is enforceable, except under certain circumstances. Provides that the estate recovery unit of the office of Medicaid policy and planning is a reasonably ascertainable creditor if the decedent was at least 55 years of age at the time of death. Extends the time period for county clerks to issue letters testamentary or of administration from five months to seven months. Allows for the deduction

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creditors' rights. Makes various changes to probate and trust law relating to creditors' claims, claims against nonprobate transferees, and no contest provisions in wills and trusts. Defines "no contest provision". Provides that a no contest provision is enforceable, except under certain circumstances. Provides that the estate recovery unit of the office of Medicaid policy and planning is a reasonably ascertainable creditor if the decedent was at least 55 years of age at the time of death. Extends the time period for county clerks to issue letters testamentary or of administration from five months to seven months. Allows for the deduction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenatePublic Law 163
2018-03-21SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-03-20SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-19HouseSigned by the Speaker
2018-03-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2018-03-14HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 394: yeas 98, nays 0
2018-03-14SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 384: yeas 48, nays 0
2018-03-13SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2018-03-13HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2018-03-12SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2018-03-08HouseHouse advisors appointed: Engleman, Washburne and Hatfield
2018-03-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: Steuerwald and DeLaney
2018-03-08SenateSenate advisors appointed: Zakas, Taylor G and Young M
2018-03-08SenateSenate conferees appointed: Koch and Randolph Lonnie M
2018-03-08SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2018-03-08SenateMotion to dissent filed
2018-03-02HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2018-03-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 285: yeas 95, nays 0
2018-02-28HouseAmendment #1 (Steuerwald) prevailed; voice vote
2018-02-28HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2018-02-26HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-02-22HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as cosponsor
2018-02-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-07SenateReferred to the House
2018-02-06SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Steuerwald
2018-02-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 175: yeas 48, nays 0
2018-02-05SenateAmendment #1 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote
2018-02-05SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2018-02-01SenateSenator Young M added as third author
2018-02-01SenateSenator Zakas added as second author
2018-02-01SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Koch

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/bills/senate/247/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/1/7/bf17a4e9/SB0247.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/7/a/ac7a8fe4/SB0247.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/e/2/5fe29424/SB0247.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/b/a/6dba283b/SB0247.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/6/b/076b29f8/SB0247.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/9/f/649fa15a/SB0247.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/5/1/4851949e/SB0247.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/e/1/dce1d1ad/SB0247.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/0/1/7e015e8b/SB0247.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/0/0/4d00363a/SB0247.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/6/1/27611c55/SB0247.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/a/a/44aa3e2b/SB0247.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/6/9/a469c09b/SB0247.175.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/4/a/d04a38b1/SB0247.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/5/7/cc57e588/SB0247.285.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/0/9/010907d6/SB0247.384.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/5/5/ba55e1bf/SB0247.394.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback