IN SB0246 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Mental health services. Requires a school corporation, charter school, or accredited nonpublic school to certify to the department of homeland security that the school corporation, charter school, or accredited nonpublic school has a memorandum of understanding in place with a community mental health center or provider certified or licensed by the state to provide mental and behavioral health services to students before applying for a grant from the Indiana secured school fund. Provides that the community mental health center or provider may be employed by the school corporation, charter school, or accredited nonpublic school. Requires a school corporation and a charter school to enter into a memorandum of understanding with a community mental health center or provider certified or licensed by the state to provide mental and behavioral health services to students. Requires the division of mental health and addiction to develop a memorandum of understanding for referral and assist school corporations and charter schools in obtaining a memorandum of understanding with a community mental health center or an appropriate provider. Requires each school corporation and charter school that enters into a memorandum of understanding with a community mental health center or appropriate provider to comply with certain confidentiality and referral requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Austin) prevailed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenatePublic Law 69
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-10HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 350: yeas 83, nays 2
2020-03-10SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 358: yeas 48, nays 0
2020-03-10HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-10SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Schaibley, Sherman, Hatfield and Shackleford
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Cook and Austin
2020-03-03SenateSenate advisors appointed: Merritt, Randolph Lonnie M, Becker and Ford J.D.
2020-03-03SenateSenate conferees appointed: Crider and Mrvan
2020-03-03SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2020-03-03SenateMotion to dissent filed
2020-02-24SenateSenator Grooms added as coauthor
2020-02-19HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2020-02-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 188: yeas 95, nays 2
2020-02-17HouseRepresentative Hatfield added as cosponsor
2020-02-17HouseAmendment #1 (Austin) prevailed; Roll Call 179: yeas 95, nays 0
2020-02-17HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-13HouseRepresentative Shackleford added as cosponsor
2020-02-13HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-11HouseRepresentative Schaibley added as cosponsor
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2020-01-22SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-21SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2020-01-21SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2020-01-21SenateSenator Melton added as coauthor
2020-01-21SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
2020-01-21SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor
2020-01-21SenateSenator Raatz added as coauthor
2020-01-21SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2020-01-21SenateSenator Mrvan added as coauthor
2020-01-21SenateSenator Merritt added as second author
2020-01-21SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Cook
2020-01-21SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 32: yeas 50, nays 0
2020-01-16SenateSenator Becker added as coauthor
2020-01-16SenateAmendment #1 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote
2020-01-16SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-09SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2020-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Crider

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/246/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/f/9/43f97062/SB0246.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/2/f/3f2f7388/SB0246.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/0/f/770f2d27/SB0246.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/b/1/33b14254/SB0246.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/f/2/c7f2e790/SB0246.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/3/2/c3324d0e/SB0246.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/5/e/155eaacb/SB0246.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/e/7/f4e780c7/SB0246.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/5/9/b3593349/SB0246.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/4/4/494469e6/SB0246.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/8/7/4d87bd42/SB0246.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/b/7/e0b74dd4/SB0246.32_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/e/0/f3e07334/SB0246.03.ENGS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/8/4/5f84329b/SB0246.179_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/4/7/ce47d807/SB0246.188_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/7/7/f5770e8d/SB0246.350_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/3/b/133bfafb/SB0246.358_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback