IN SB0246 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Second reading: ordered engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Second reading: ordered engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Local public questions. Provides that except as otherwise specifically provided by a statute, a local public question may be placed on the ballot only at the following elections: (1) A general election. (2) A municipal general election, but only if the election district for the public question is contained entirely within a municipality. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Local public questions. Provides that except as otherwise specifically provided by a statute, a local public question may be placed on the ballot only at the following elections: (1) A general election. (2) A municipal general election, but only if the election district for the public question is contained entirely within a municipality. Makes conforming changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senator Gaskill added as third author |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Spartz added as second author |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Doriot |