IN SB0246 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Public Law 263
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Child neglect defense. Specifies under the safe haven law that it is a defense to a claim of neglect of a dependent if the individual left the child: (1) with a person who is an emergency medical services provider; or (2) in a newborn safety device that meets the specified requirements. Allows a newborn safety device that was installed on January 1, 2017, to continue to operate. Provides civil immunity for a hospital that operates a newborn safety device if the device meets specified requirements, unless the act or omission constitutes gross negligence or willful or wanton misconduct. Provides that

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child neglect defense. Specifies under the safe haven law that it is a defense to a claim of neglect of a dependent if the individual left the child: (1) with a person who is an emergency medical services provider; or (2) in a newborn safety device that meets the specified requirements. Allows a newborn safety device that was installed on January 1, 2017, to continue to operate. Provides civil immunity for a hospital that operates a newborn safety device if the device meets specified requirements, unless the act or omission constitutes gross negligence or willful or wanton misconduct. Provides that

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02SenatePublic Law 263
2017-05-02SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-21SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-13SenateSenate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 467: yeas 47, nays 3
2017-04-10SenateMotion to concur filed
2017-04-07HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2017-04-06HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 411: yeas 92, nays 4
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #1 (Heine) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-05HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-04-03HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-28SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-27SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Carbaugh
2017-02-27SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 199: yeas 46, nays 3
2017-02-23SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-23SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-20SenateSenator Ford added as coauthor
2017-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-02SenateSenator Head added as second author
2017-01-09SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
2017-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Holdman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/246/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/f/7/a5f765b3/SB0246.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/e/c/47ecd54c/SB0246.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/2/d/c42d8d53/SB0246.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/e/8/24e8df67/SB0246.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/a/2/a3a2f006/SB0246.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/5/3/1653624c/SB0246.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/c/9/b7c99427/SB0246.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/6/0/5760c3ad/SB0246.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/9/d/e39dd95a/SB0246.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/4/b/604ba1df/SB0246.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/1/3/1d1306be/SB0246.199.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/e/1/3de1499d/SB0246.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/a/0/e0a02c34/SB0246.411.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/5/5/3655e423/SB0246.467.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback