IN SB0244 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher supplemental pay. Establishes additional circumstances for which a school corporation may provide supplemental payments to teachers in excess of the salary specified in the school corporation's compensation plan. Provides that a teacher rated improvement necessary in the teacher's annual performance evaluation is eligible to receive a partial raise or increment. (Current law provides that such a teacher may not receive a raise or increment.) Relocates provisions regarding supplemental payments for teachers.
Title
Teacher supplemental pay.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Carbaugh |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative DeVon |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 151: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senators Donato and Rogers added as coauthors |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Spartz added as third author |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown L |