IN SB0244 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Amendment 2 (Merritt), prevailed; Roll Call 84: Yeas 32, Nays 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a beer and wine wholesaler to wholesale liquor, if: (1) the liquor primary source of supply has been the wholesaler's primary source of supply for wine for at least ten years; and (2) the brand of liquor that the beer wholesaler intends to wholesale has not been distributed in the state for more than two years immediately preceding the first sale of the liquor to the holder of the beer wholesaler's permit. Provides that if a primary source of supply terminates or reduces a liquor wholesaler's distribution rights of a brand, the wholesaler that receives the distribution rights (successor wholesaler) must compensate the terminated wholesaler for the fair market value of the lost distribution rights, less any amount paid to the original wholesaler by the primary source of supply for the distribution rights to the discontinued brand. Provides that unless otherwise agreed to by the parties, if the successor wholesaler does not compensate the terminated wholesaler within a specified period of time, either party may submit the matter to arbitration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage wholesalers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-01 Amendment 2 (Merritt), prevailed; Roll Call 84: Yeas 32, Nays 14
2010-02-01 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-28 Senator Landske added as coauthor
2010-01-28 Senator Alting added as second author
2010-01-28 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-21 Senator Waterman added as coauthor
2010-01-11 First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Public Policy & Interstate Cooperation
2010-01-11 Authored by Senator Merritt

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback