IN SB0243 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Law 185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Law 185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nonconsensual pornography. Defines "intimate image" and provides that a person who: (1) knows that an individual does not consent to the distribution of an intimate image of the individual; and (2) distributes the intimate image on the Internet; commits internet distribution of an intimate image, a Class A misdemeanor. Increases the penalty to a Level 6 felony for a second or subsequent offense.
Title
Nonconsensual pornography. Defines "intimate image" and provides that a person who: (1) knows that an individual does not consent to the distribution of an intimate image of the individual; and (2) distributes the intimate image on the Internet; commits internet distribution of an intimate image, a Class A misdemeanor. Increases the penalty to a Level 6 felony for a second or subsequent offense.
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. James Buck [R] |
Rep. Mike Speedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Public Law 185 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-23 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 610: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 569: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2019-04-23 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2019-04-22 | House | House advisors appointed: McNamara, Young J, Dvorak and Hatcher |
2019-04-22 | House | House conferees appointed: Speedy and Pierce |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Bohacek, Tallian and Young M |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Freeman and Randolph Lonnie M |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Concurrence withdrawn |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-04-08 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 419: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2019-04-02 | House | Amendment #1 (Speedy) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-04-02 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Speedy |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 221: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as second author |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Freeman |