IN SB0242 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 426: yeas 42, nays 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 426: yeas 42, nays 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State and local administration. Provides that the lottery commission must obtain a tax clearance statement from the department of state revenue (DOR) for a retailer before the lottery commission may enter into a contract with that retailer. Repeals the riverboat admissions tax provisions scheduled to expire July 1, 2018. Reorganizes the supplemental wagering tax law. Specifies that gaming activity information shall be reported to the gaming commission daily. Provides that taxes withheld from riverboat and racino winnings are due on a monthly basis rather than the day after the winnings are paid. Provides that money in the Indiana horse racing
Title
State and local administration. Provides that the lottery commission must obtain a tax clearance statement from the department of state revenue (DOR) for a retailer before the lottery commission may enter into a contract with that retailer. Repeals the riverboat admissions tax provisions scheduled to expire July 1, 2018. Reorganizes the supplemental wagering tax law. Specifies that gaming activity information shall be reported to the gaming commission daily. Provides that taxes withheld from riverboat and racino winnings are due on a monthly basis rather than the day after the winnings are paid. Provides that money in the Indiana horse racing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 426: yeas 42, nays 5 |
2018-03-14 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Representative Huston added as conferee |
2018-03-14 | House | Representative Porter removed as conferee |
2018-03-14 | House | Representative Huston removed as advisor |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as conferee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senator Stoops removed as conferee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senator Tallian removed as advisor |
2018-03-07 | House | House advisors appointed: Huston, Thompson, Leonard, Cherry, DeLaney and Pryor |
2018-03-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Brown T and Porter |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Houchin, Tallian, Perfect and Zay |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Holdman and Stoops |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2018-03-06 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2018-03-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 313: yeas 81, nays 14 |
2018-03-01 | House | Amendment #5 (Brown T) prevailed; Division of the House: yeas 49, nays 43 |
2018-03-01 | House | Amendment #2 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-01 | House | Amendment #3 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-01 | House | Amendment #1 (Brown T) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-01 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Huston |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Brown T |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 173: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |