IN SB0242 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Loans to credit union officers. For purposes of the statute authorizing a state chartered credit union to make a loan to an officer of the credit union, makes the lending limit consistent with federal law that applies to loans to officers of a bank. (Current law provides that the total of all such outstanding loans may not exceed $100,000.)
Title
Loans to credit union officers. For purposes of the statute authorizing a state chartered credit union to make a loan to an officer of the credit union, makes the lending limit consistent with federal law that applies to loans to officers of a bank. (Current law provides that the total of all such outstanding loans may not exceed $100,000.)
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Charles Burton [R] |
Rep. Greg Beumer [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 40 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-02-24 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2016-02-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 229: yeas 99, nays 0 |
2016-02-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Beumer |
2016-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Burton |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 95: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second author |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Walker) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance & Financial Institutions |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Walker |