IN SB0242 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-30 - Referred to committee on Courts and Criminal Code pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-30 - Referred to committee on Courts and Criminal Code pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle title fraud. Defines "motor vehicle", for purposes of the financial responsibility laws, to include a motor vehicle titled by an individual using a federal identification number issued to a business entity. Provides that a court may suspend the registration certificate and plates of a motor vehicle that is titled to a nonqualified individual who commits title application fraud. Defines "nonqualified individual" as a person who is not eligible to receive a Social Security number or federal identification number. Provides that a nonqualified individual who establishes a business entity for the purpose of obtaining a certificate of title for
Title
Motor vehicle title fraud. Defines "motor vehicle", for purposes of the financial responsibility laws, to include a motor vehicle titled by an individual using a federal identification number issued to a business entity. Provides that a court may suspend the registration certificate and plates of a motor vehicle that is titled to a nonqualified individual who commits title application fraud. Defines "nonqualified individual" as a person who is not eligible to receive a Social Security number or federal identification number. Provides that a nonqualified individual who establishes a business entity for the purpose of obtaining a certificate of title for
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Rep. Mike Speedy [R] |
Rep. Justin Moed [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Referred to committee on Courts and Criminal Code pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2015-03-26 | House | Representative Moed added as cosponsor |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third author |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Speedy added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 228: yeas 42, nays 8 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Young R Michael) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young R Michael |