IN SB0242 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 78
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 78
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Homeland security matters.
Title
Homeland security matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Reread third time: passed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Reread third time: passed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 78 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-01 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2013-04-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 367: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2013-03-28 | House | Representatives Zent and Macer added as cosponsors |
2013-03-28 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-26 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-03-25 | House | Representative Klinker added as cosponsor |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2013-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Frye |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reread third time: passed; Roll Call 59: yeas 47, nays 2 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Wyss), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Third reading: placed back on second reading |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Third reading: call withdrawn |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as second author |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Wyss |