IN SB0241 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Pro bono legal services fee. Removes the sunset provision for pro bono legal service fees.
Title
Pro bono legal services fee.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Boehnlein [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. Mike Gaskill [R] |
Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] |
Sen. Brian Buchanan [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Rep. John Young [R] |
Rep. Gerald Torr [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Torr |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Young J |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 115: yeas 46, nays 2 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senators Kruse and Young M added as coauthors |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senators Gaskill, Rogers, Raatz, Buck added as coauthors |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as coauthor |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boehnlein |