IN SB0241 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Representatives Davisson, Clere, Shackleford added as cosponsors
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Pharmacy benefit managers regulation. Requires a pharmacy benefit manager to obtain a license issued by the department of insurance and sets forth requirements of the pharmacy benefit manager. Provides for the commissioner of the department of insurance to adopt rules to specify licensure, financial standards, and reporting requirements that apply to a pharmacy benefit manager. Sets forth requirements of a pharmacy benefit manager's reimbursement for a contracted pharmacy when using a maximum allowable cost for a drug product. Allows a party that has contracted with a pharmacy benefit manager to request an audit of compliance at least one time per year. Makes violations of the chapter concerning pharmacy benefit managers an unfair or deceptive act or practice in the business of insurance. Repeals the chapter of existing language on pharmacy benefit managers and moves the language concerning maximum allowable cost lists to the new chapter. Allows a pharmacy benefit manager to obtain the license not later than December 31, 2020, in order to do business in Indiana and provide services for any health provider contract beginning January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy benefit managers regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseRepresentatives Davisson, Clere, Shackleford added as cosponsors
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2020-01-31SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-30SenateSenator Taylor G added as coauthor
2020-01-30SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Lehman
2020-01-30SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 100: yeas 46, nays 2
2020-01-28SenateAmendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote
2020-01-28SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-23SenateSenators Ruckelshaus and Grooms added as coauthors
2020-01-23SenateSenator Mishler added as coauthor
2020-01-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-21SenateSenator Tomes added as coauthor
2020-01-16SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2020-01-14SenateSenator Merritt added as third author
2020-01-14SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second author
2020-01-09SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2020-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Brown L

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback