IN SB0238 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Designated outdoor refreshment areas. Modifies the term "entertainment complex." Allows a county or municipality to designate an area of the county or municipality as an outdoor refreshment area (refreshment area) with the approval of the alcohol and tobacco commission (commission). Provides that if a refreshment area is approved, the commission designates retailer permittees (designated permittees) located within the refreshment area. Allows a consumer to exit a designated permittee's premises with one open container of an alcoholic beverage at a time to consume within the refreshment area. Limits the volume of an open container (based upon the type of alcoholic beverage) that a designated permittee may sell or furnish to a consumer for a refreshment area. Requires a consumer to wear a wristband in order to exit a licensed premises into a refreshment area with an open container. Allows a minor to be present in a refreshment area. Allows a county or municipality to adopt an ordinance at any time to dissolve a refreshment area. Makes the following acts a Class C infraction: (1) A person who exits a designated permittee's premises with an open container of an alcoholic beverage without wearing a wristband identification. (2) A designated permittee who allows a person with an open container of an alcoholic beverage to exit the premises without wearing a wristband identification. (3) A designated permittee who sells or furnishes a person with: (A) an open container of an alcoholic beverage that exceeds the container volume limitations; or (B) two or more open containers of alcoholic beverages at a time. (4) A person who consumes an open container of an alcoholic beverage purchased from a designated permittee outside the refreshment area. (5) A person who brings an alcoholic beverage into a refreshment area that was not purchased from a designated permittee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designated outdoor refreshment areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2021-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-04SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-02-02SenateSenator Tallian added as third author
2021-02-02SenateCosponsor: Representative Bartels
2021-02-02SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Smaltz
2021-02-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 51: yeas 39, nays 8
2021-02-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-26SenateSenator Zay added as second author
2021-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2021-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Brown L

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/238/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/3/6/0c3611b4/SB0238.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/2/a/ff2a108e/SB0238.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/9/f/fa9f2cb2/SB0238.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/9/6/62966852/SB0238.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/6/8/ec6831b3/SB0238.03.COMS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/0/1/ce018fe1/SB0238.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/7/6/9976044d/SB0238.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/7/0/1170a5e4/SB0238.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/f/e/00fe37ef/SB0238.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/a/4/5fa4ec56/SB0238.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/9/e/959eef23/SB0238.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/5/6/f1561ef8/SB0238.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/e/c/03ecfb60/SB0238.51_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback