IN SB0238 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the state police department to establish a program to inspect private buses. Provides that the state police department is not required to conduct the inspections. Provides that an inspection that complies with regulations of the United States Department of Transportation satisfies the requirements of the program established by the state police. Requires the owner of a private bus to provide to the bureau of motor vehicles an unexpired certificate of inspection for the private bus before the owner may register or reregister the private bus.
Title
Inspection of private buses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Floor - (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Roll Call 023802 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs - Roll Call 023801 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Floor - (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Roll Call 023802 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs - Roll Call 023801 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Public Law 160 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 358: yeas 38 and nays 11 |
2014-02-25 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-02-25 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 277: yeas 82 and nays 13 |
2014-02-24 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-24 | House | SB 238 Amendment #1 (Bartlett) motion ruled out of order. |
2014-02-24 | House | SB 238 Amendment #3 (Thompson), prevailed. |
2014-02-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | House | First Reading: Referred to Roads and Transportation |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative Frye added as sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 71: yeas 33 and nays 14 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as second author. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee report; do pass amend; adopted |
2014-01-09 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Wyss. |