IN SB0235 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Guardianships. Requires a guardian of a protected adult to permit all appropriate contact, communication, and social interaction between the protected adult and individuals with whom the protected adult had significant past family or social relationships, subject to a determination by the guardian, after consideration of all relevant facts and circumstances, that contact, communication, or social interaction with the protected adult should be limited, supervised, or prohibited in order to prevent harm to the protected adult's health, person, or property. Provides that any act or omission by the guardian in permitting contact, communication, and social interaction with the protected adult is
Title
Guardianships. Requires a guardian of a protected adult to permit all appropriate contact, communication, and social interaction between the protected adult and individuals with whom the protected adult had significant past family or social relationships, subject to a determination by the guardian, after consideration of all relevant facts and circumstances, that contact, communication, or social interaction with the protected adult should be limited, supervised, or prohibited in order to prevent harm to the protected adult's health, person, or property. Provides that any act or omission by the guardian in permitting contact, communication, and social interaction with the protected adult is
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Dale DeVon [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-20 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative DeVon |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 143: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |