IN SB0235 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Public Law 158
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires community corrections programs to use evidence based services, programs, and practices that reduce the risk for recidivism. Permits the community corrections board to coordinate or operate certain programs. Establishes standards for the award of certain grants by the department of correction, and requires the department of correction to consult with the judicial conference and the division of mental health and addiction before awarding grants. Defines "mental health and addiction forensic treatment services", establishes eligibility and treatment criteria, and creates the mental health and addiction forensic treatment services account to fund mental health and addiction forensic treatment services. Requires the judicial conference to discuss with the department of correction and the division of mental health and addiction before awarding financial assistance, and requires any person providing mental health and substance use treatment services to be certified by the division of mental health and addiction. Provides that the department of correction may provide financial assistance to community corrections programs from the mental health and addiction forensic treatment services account. Allows for the establishment of a three year pilot project in Marion County to reduce recidivism by providing mental health and forensic treatment services. Extends Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program and Temporary Assistance for Needy Families benefits for individuals participating in the Marion County mental health pilot project and other evidence based treatment programs. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the criminal law and sentencing policy study committee.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health pilot project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 023503 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 023502 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 023501 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26SenatePublic Law 158
2014-03-26SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-14SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-13SenateConference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 413: yeas 46 and nays 0
2014-03-12HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 472: yeas 98 and nays 0
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative Lawson added as advisor
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as advisor
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative Washburne added as advisor
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative McMillin added as advisor
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative Pierce added as conferee
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative Steuerwald added as conferee
2014-03-06SenateSenator Randolph added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Pat Miller added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Taylor added as conferee
2014-03-06SenateSenator M. Young added as conferee
2014-03-06SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2014-03-06SenateMotion to Withdraw Concurrence: prevailed
2014-02-27HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2014-02-27HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 337: yeas 93 and nays 0
2014-02-26HouseSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-24HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-10HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code
2014-02-04SenateSenator Merritt added as coauthor.
2014-02-04SenateSenator Becker added as coauthor.
2014-02-04SenateSenator Crider added as coauthor.
2014-02-04SenateSenator Banks added as coauthor.
2014-02-04SenateSenator Schneider added as coauthor.
2014-02-04SenateSenator Delph added as coauthor.
2014-02-04SenateSenator Alting added as coauthor.
2014-02-04SenateRepresentative Frizzell added as cosponsor.
2014-02-04SenateRepresentative Steuerwald added as sponsor.
2014-02-04SenateReferred to the House
2014-02-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 162: yeas 48 and nays 0
2014-02-03SenateSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-01-16SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor.
2014-01-15SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor.
2014-01-15SenateSenator Taylor added as third author.
2014-01-15SenateSenator Pat Miller added as second author.
2014-01-15HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Appropriations.
2014-01-09SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Corrections & Criminal Law
2014-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Young R. Michael

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/235/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/5/0/c250f9cd/SB0235.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/6/e/a56e6a35/SB0235.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/5/f/935f6fd1/SB0235.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/0/4/f204015c/SB0235.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/2/3/c323a31b/SB0235.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/f/7/06f7fb54/SB0235.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/a/f/61af7330/SB0235.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/a/a/f2aaafd3/SB0235.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/5/8/495842bf/SB0235.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/8/1/3581f4cc/SB0235.03.COMS.162.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/e/b/b9eb3268/SB0235.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/7/9/b1791280/SB0235.03.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/6/4/fd6429a3/SB0235.04.COMH.337.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/5/6/f3569935/SB0235.04.COMH.472.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/0/0/34004322/SB0235.04.COMH.413.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback