IN SB0234 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House advisor appointed: Davis and V. Smith
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House advisor appointed: Davis and V. Smith
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes references to "synthetic cannabinoids" to "synthetic drugs". Adds additional chemical compounds (including some compounds sold as "bath salts") to the definition of synthetic drugs and expands the definition to encompass certain chemical compounds that are structurally related to listed synthetic drugs. Authorizes the board of pharmacy to adopt emergency rules to define certain compounds as synthetic drugs if these compounds are scheduled by: (1) the DEA; or (2) another state. Provides that an emergency rule becomes effective 30 days after it is filed with the publisher and expires on June 30 of the calendar year following its adoption. Provides that if the department of state revenue (department) finds that a person has been convicted of selling or offering to sell a synthetic drug that was offered for sale by a retail merchant in a place of business for which the retail merchant has been issued a registered retail merchant certificate, the department: (1) shall suspend the registered retail merchant certificate for the place of business for one year; and (2) may not issue another retail merchant certificate for one year to any person that applied for or made a retail transaction under the suspended retail merchant certificate or that owned or co-owned, directly or indirectly, or was an officer, a director, a manager, or a partner of the retail merchant that was issued the suspended retail merchant certificate. Makes technical corrections.
Title
Synthetic drugs (including "bath salts").
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House - Amendment 1 (McMillin), prevailed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House - Amendment 1 (McMillin), prevailed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | House advisor appointed: Davis and V. Smith | |
2012-03-08 | House conferees appointed: Dermody and Austin | |
2012-03-08 | Senate advisor appointed: Bray and Arnold | |
2012-03-08 | Senate conferee appointed: Steele and Broden | |
2012-03-08 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2012-02-21 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2012-02-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 214: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2012-02-20 | Amendment 1 (McMillin), prevailed; Roll Call 198: yeas 94, nays 0 | |
2012-02-20 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-16 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code | |
2012-02-07 | Representatives Yarde, Austin and Davisson added as cosponsors | |
2012-01-31 | Senators Landske, Wyss and Paul added as coauthors | |
2012-01-31 | House sponsor: Rep. M. Smith | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 127: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-30 | Senator Buck added as coauthor | |
2012-01-26 | Senator Head added as coauthor | |
2012-01-26 | Senator Charbonneau added as third author | |
2012-01-26 | Amendment 1 (Merritt), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-26 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-24 | Senator R. Young added as coauthor | |
2012-01-24 | Senator Glick added as coauthor | |
2012-01-24 | Senator Zakas added as coauthor | |
2012-01-24 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-19 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2012-01-19 | Senator Miller added as coauthor | |
2012-01-17 | Senator Steele added as coauthor | |
2012-01-09 | Senator Kruse added as coauthor | |
2012-01-09 | Senators Broden and Arnold added as coauthors | |
2012-01-05 | Senator Holdman added as coauthor | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senators Alting and Merritt |