IN SB0233 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Winter holidays in schools, cities, and towns. Provides that a school corporation may: (1) instruct students about the history of traditional winter celebrations; (2) allow the use of traditional greetings concerning the celebrations; and (3) display on school property scenes or symbols associated with traditional winter celebrations if certain conditions are met and the scenes or symbols do not include a message that encourages a particular religious belief. Requires the state board of education to develop guidelines to assist school corporations in developing appropriate instruction and displays. Provides that the legislative body of a city, including a consolidated city, or
Title
Winter holidays in schools, cities, and towns. Provides that a school corporation may: (1) instruct students about the history of traditional winter celebrations; (2) allow the use of traditional greetings concerning the celebrations; and (3) display on school property scenes or symbols associated with traditional winter celebrations if certain conditions are met and the scenes or symbols do not include a message that encourages a particular religious belief. Requires the state board of education to develop guidelines to assist school corporations in developing appropriate instruction and displays. Provides that the legislative body of a city, including a consolidated city, or
Sponsors
Sen. James Smith [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] |
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Rep. Milo Smith [R] | Rep. Charles Burton [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senators Leising, Young, M. added as coauthors |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Representative Burton added as cosponsor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Representative Smith, M. added as sponsor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 121: yeas 48, nays 2 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Stoops) failed; Division of the Senate: yeas 9, nays 31 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as third author |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Education & Career Development |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smith J |