IN SB0233 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes pharmacy technician certification to licensure. Adds a high school graduation, high school equivalency certificate, or state general educational development requirement for pharmacy technician licensure. Specifies education and training requirements for pharmacy technicians. Provides for the licensure of anesthesiologist assistants. Establishes a Class B misdemeanor for professing to be an anesthesiologist assistant without a license. Provides for the licensure of diabetes educators. Provides that certified registered nurse anesthetists may be recognized as advanced practice nurses under certain circumstances.
Title
Professional licensing matters.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Richard Bray [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] |
Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Roll Call 023303 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 023301 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Roll Call 023303 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 023301 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Public Law 58 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 385: yeas 42 and nays 4 |
2014-03-11 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 441: yeas 89 and nays 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Bacon added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Davisson added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Stemler added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Shackleford added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative C. Brown added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Thompson added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Clere added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Stemler removed as cosponsor. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Bray added as advisor |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as advisor |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Pat Miller added as advisor |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as conferee |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as conferee |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2014-02-27 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-02-27 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 336: yeas 93 and nays 0 |
2014-02-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-26 | House | SB 233 Amendment #2 (Shackleford), prevailed. |
2014-02-26 | House | SB 233 Amendment #1 (Bacon), prevailed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Public Health |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Stemler added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Clere added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Bacon added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Davisson added sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 161: yeas 47 and nays 1 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Bray added as second author. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Bray removed as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | SB 233 Amendment #1 (Grooms), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator Bray added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Grooms. |