IN SB0231 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Public Law 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Public Law 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Direct sales. Excludes a direct seller from the definition of "employee" for purposes of the minimum wage law. Excludes services by direct sellers from the definition of "employment" under the unemployment compensation system.
Title
Direct sales. Excludes a direct seller from the definition of "employee" for purposes of the minimum wage law. Excludes services by direct sellers from the definition of "employment" under the unemployment compensation system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Amendment #1 (Gaskill) prevailed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Amendment #1 (Gaskill) prevailed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Public Law 7 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2019-03-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 304: yeas 92, nays 2 |
2019-03-07 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-05 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehman |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 82: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Perfect added as second author |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Gaskill) prevailed; Roll Call 57: yeas 46, nays 3 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Messmer |