IN SB0231 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that agencies of state government, state educational institutions, and political subdivisions may not enter into contracts with persons that engage in investment activities in Iran. Provides that a financial institution may not be designated as a public depository if the financial institution engages in investment activities in Iran. Requires the Indiana department of administration, using credible information available to the public, to establish a list of persons who engage in investment activities in Iran. Provides for the inclusion of persons on the list and the removal of persons from the list.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contracting with persons that invest in Iran.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-06 Signed by the Governor
2012-02-29 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-02-27 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-02-27 Signed by the Speaker
2012-02-21 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2012-02-21 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 221: yeas 95, nays 0
2012-02-20 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-16 Representative Bosma added as cosponsor
2012-02-16 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-02-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2012-01-30 Cosponsors: Reps. Davis and Candelaria Reardon
2012-01-30 House sponsor: Rep. Turner
2012-01-30 Referred to the House
2012-01-30 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 85: yeas 49 and nays 1
2012-01-24 Amendment 1 (Wyss), prevailed; voice vote
2012-01-24 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-01-23 Senators Banks and Kruse added as coauthors
2012-01-19 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-01-17 Senator Rogers added as coauthor
2012-01-17 Senators Merritt, Becker and Lanane added as coauthors
2012-01-10 Senator Delph added as coauthor
2012-01-04 First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs
2012-01-04 Authored by Senators Wyss, Broden and M. Young

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback