IN SB0230 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the worker's compensation board (board) to certify one or more data bases to be used to determine pecuniary liability of an employer or an employer's insurance carrier for a specific service or product covered under worker's compensation or occupational diseases compensation. Establishes a proof of coverage filing fee of two dollars, and specifies that the fee be deposited in the worker's compensation supplemental administrative fund to pay the board's expenses related to health provider claim dispute resolution. Allows an insurance carrier filing proof of coverage on behalf of an employer to update the board's records and pay the filing fee on the last business day of each quarter or at another time the board specifies by rule.
Title
Worker's compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions | |
2012-01-31 | Cosponsor: Rep. Torr | |
2012-01-31 | House sponsor: Rep. Lehman | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 126: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-30 | Senator Tallian added as coauthor | |
2012-01-30 | Amendment 1 (Boots), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-30 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-20 | Senator Boots added as second author | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Smith |