IN SB0230 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that if the governing body of a public agency of a political subdivision provides initial notice of public meetings to members of the governing body or public officials by electronic mail, the governing body of a public agency shall also give initial public notice by electronic mail to any person (excluding news media) who annually requests notice of meetings. Provides that a governing body that fails to give initial notice by electronic mail: (1) does not invalidate any proceedings of the governing body including the validity of any bonds issued; and (2) a court may not declare void any policy, decision, or final action or final action of the governing body based on the failure to give notice.
Title
E-mail notification of local government meetings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-02-02 | Senator Lanane added as coauthor | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. Stilwell | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 120: Yeas 35 and Nays 15 | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Schneider added as second author | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor | |
2010-02-01 | Amendment 1 (Waltz), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-01-11 | Authored by Senator Waltz |