IN SB0229 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Public Law 166
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Maintenance of regulated drains. Provides that a permit is not required from the Indiana department of environmental management for the maintenance or reconstruction of a regulated drain in accordance with certain best management practices for purposes of the law concerning state regulated wetlands, as long as the work takes place within the current easement and the reconstruction does not substantially change the characteristics of the drain to perform the function for which it was designed and constructed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maintenance of regulated drains.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 55 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Amendment #5 (Errington) failed (Y: 33 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25SenatePublic Law 166
2020-03-25SenateSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-11HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 377: yeas 55, nays 29
2020-03-11SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 383: yeas 32, nays 17
2020-03-11HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-11SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-10HouseRepresentative Prescott added as conferee
2020-03-10HouseRepresentative Errington removed as conferee
2020-03-10HouseRepresentative Prescott removed as advisor
2020-03-10SenateSenator Doriot added as conferee
2020-03-10SenateSenator Stoops removed as conferee
2020-03-10SenateSenator Doriot removed as advisor
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Doriot, Tallian and Rogers
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Spartz and Stoops
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Prescott, Abbott, Steuerwald, Bauer and Deal
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Wolkins and Errington
2020-03-04SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2020-03-04SenateMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2020-03-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 286: yeas 58, nays 37
2020-03-02HouseRepresentative Cherry added as cosponsor
2020-03-02HouseAmendment #5 (Errington) failed; Roll Call 245: yeas 33, nays 59
2020-03-02HouseAmendment #2 (Wesco) prevailed; voice vote
2020-03-02HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-27HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-25HouseReassigned to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2020-01-22SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-21SenateSenator Rogers added as third author
2020-01-21SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Wolkins
2020-01-21SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 31: yeas 32, nays 18
2020-01-16SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-14SenateSenator Doriot added as second author
2020-01-13SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2020-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Spartz

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/229/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/7/5/9d75eafa/SB0229.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/5/1/ad519ea9/SB0229.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/b/0/c4b07ded/SB0229.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/6/5/d5656daa/SB0229.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/b/4/61b4365b/SB0229.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/6/a/9e6a613e/SB0229.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/3/8/89382d62/SB0229.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/e/e/36eeb77e/SB0229.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/5/8/355884e8/SB0229.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/1/8/e818745f/SB0229.31_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/4/4/3e440e55/SB0229.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/c/9/1bc91b00/SB0229.245_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/7/d/1d7d339b/SB0229.286_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/e/1/00e1764f/SB0229.377_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/c/6/e1c6881d/SB0229.383_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback