IN SB0229 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Catastrophic injury. Defines "catastrophic injury", and permits a court to impose an additional fixed term of five to 10 years if a person commits certain offenses that cause the victim to suffer catastrophic injury. Prohibits imposing an additional fixed term if the same facts necessary to establish the catastrophic injury are used to prove an element of the offense.
Title
Catastrophic injury. Defines "catastrophic injury", and permits a court to impose an additional fixed term of five to 10 years if a person commits certain offenses that cause the victim to suffer catastrophic injury. Prohibits imposing an additional fixed term if the same facts necessary to establish the catastrophic injury are used to prove an element of the offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-20 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Washburne |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 142: yeas 40, nays 9 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senator Koch removed as coauthor |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Koch added as coauthor |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young R Michael |