IN SB0227 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enforcement of pesticide violations. Provides a list of violations for which the state chemist may impose a civil penalty. Eliminates the schedule of civil penalties as adopted by the Indiana pesticide review board. (Under current law, the state chemist imposes a civil penalty in accordance with a schedule of civil penalties as adopted by the Indiana pesticide review board.) Provides that the state chemist may adjust a civil penalty by 20% for certain violations if a person responsible for the violation takes mitigating actions.
Title
Enforcement of pesticide violations.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Donald Lehe [R] | Rep. John Prescott [R] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Public Law 76 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 318: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2021-03-16 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2021-03-15 | House | Representative Klinker added as cosponsor |
2021-03-15 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 259: yeas 91, nays 4 |
2021-03-11 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as third author |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senator Glick added as second author |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Prescott |
2021-01-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehe |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 13: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |