IN SB0227 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Foreclosure counseling and education fee. Extends the expiration of the $50 mortgage foreclosure counseling and education fee to July 1, 2018. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foreclosure counseling and education fee. Extends the expiration of the $50 mortgage foreclosure counseling and education fee to July 1, 2018. Makes conforming amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-03-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-28SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-28SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2017-02-28SenateSenator Zakas added as second author
2017-02-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Burton
2017-02-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 220: yeas 39, nays 10
2017-02-27SenateSenator Taylor G added as coauthor
2017-02-27SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-09SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2017-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Merritt

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback