IN SB0227 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a person is immune from arrest or prosecution for certain alcohol offenses if the arrest or prosecution is due to the person: (1) reporting a medical emergency; (2) being the victim of a sex offense; or (3) witnessing and reporting what the person believes to be a crime. (Current law provides immunity from arrest or prosecution only if the person reports a medical emergency that is due to alcohol consumption.) Establishes a mitigating circumstance for the sentencing of a person convicted of a controlled substance offense if the person's arrest or prosecution was facilitated in part because the person requested emergency medical assistance for an individual in need of medical assistance due to the use of alcohol or a controlled substance. Allows a court to defer entering a judgment of conviction for an individual arrested for an alcohol offense if the individual was arrested after a report that the person needed medical assistance due to the use of alcohol if certain conditions are met. Allows an advanced emergency medical technician, an emergency medical responder, an emergency medical technician, a firefighter or volunteer firefighter, a law enforcement officer, or a paramedic to administer an overdose intervention drug to a person suffering from an overdose. Allows certain health care providers to prescribe, and a pharmacist to dispense, an overdose intervention drug for an advanced emergency medical technician, an emergency medical responder, an emergency medical technician, a fire department or volunteer fire department, a law enforcement agency, or a paramedic. Requires the commission on improving the status of children in Indiana to study and evaluate: (1) crimes of sexual violence against children; and (2) the impact of social
Title
Alcohol and medical emergencies; crime studies.
Sponsors
Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Randall Frye [R] |
Rep. Christina Hale [D] | Rep. Eric Turner [R] | Rep. Linda Lawson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 022703 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 022701 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 022703 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 022701 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Public Law 156 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 370: yeas 40 and nays 0 |
2014-02-26 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-02-26 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 294: yeas 96 and nays 0 |
2014-02-26 | House | Representative Lawson added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-18 | House | SB 227 Amendment #2 (Bartlett), prevailed. |
2014-02-18 | House | SB 227 Amendment #1 (McMillin), prevailed. |
2014-02-17 | House | Representative Turner added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-13 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | House | First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative Hale added as cosponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative Frye added as cosponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative McMillin added as sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 69: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-27 | Senate | SB 227 Amendment #1 (Merritt), prevailed. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Merritt. |