IN SB0226 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Marriage and family therapists. Decreases the number of experiential practice hours required to obtain a license as a marriage and family therapist or a therapist associate. Specifies that the hours must be completed during at least 12 months.
Title
Marriage and family therapists.
Sponsors
Sen. Stacey Donato [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Shelli Yoder [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. John Crane [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Rep. Cindy Ledbetter [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Ledbetter |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 160: yeas 46, nays 3 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senators Crane and Ford Jon added as coauthors |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Becker added as second author |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Becker removed as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senators Yoder and Becker added as coauthors |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Donato |