IN SB0226 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Assigns the topic of teen suicide prevention to the health finance commission for study during the 2010 legislative interim.
Title
Teen suicide prevention.
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Errington [D] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Connie Lawson [R] | Sen. Patricia Miller [R] |
Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 29 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-01 | Senators Randolph, Mrvan and Errington added as coauthors | |
2010-03-01 | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 247: Yeas 45, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-01 | Motion to concur in House amendments filed | |
2010-02-16 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 175: Yeas 92, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-15 | Amendment 1 (Noe), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-15 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-11 | Representative Porter added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-11 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. C. Brown | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 119: Yeas 48 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-12 | Senator Kruse added as third author | |
2010-01-11 | Senator Lawson added as second author | |
2010-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development | |
2010-01-11 | Authored by Senator Miller |