IN SB0225 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Property tax exemption for affordable housing. Establishes standards for affordable rental housing property to be exempt from property taxation when the property does not otherwise qualify for a property tax exemption. Specifies that the exemption applies to properties owned by a 501(c)(3) organization (or a disregarded entity of such an organization) that are 100% occupied by residents who qualify as low income.
Title
Property tax exemption for affordable housing. Establishes standards for affordable rental housing property to be exempt from property taxation when the property does not otherwise qualify for a property tax exemption. Specifies that the exemption applies to properties owned by a 501(c)(3) organization (or a disregarded entity of such an organization) that are 100% occupied by residents who qualify as low income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Smith, M. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 91: yeas 47, nays 3 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as second author |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Eckerty) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Eckerty |