IN SB0225 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the hospital assessment fee committee, before July 1, 2013, to set a later date for the submission of specified documents. Removes language that required specified documents to have a retroactive implementation of July 1, 2011. Makes technical corrections.
Title
Hospital assessment fee matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-02-27 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-02-27 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-02-21 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2012-02-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 213: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2012-02-20 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-16 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2012-01-23 | Cosponsor: Rep. C. Brown | |
2012-01-23 | House sponsor: Rep. T. Brown | |
2012-01-23 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-23 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 48: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-17 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-12 | Senator Breaux added as third author | |
2012-01-12 | Senator Gard added as second author | |
2012-01-12 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Miller |