IN SB0224 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
Pending: House Elections and Apportionment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
Pending: House Elections and Apportionment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Various elections matters. Defines "election worker" and makes it a Level 6 felony to take certain actions: (1) for the purpose of influencing an election worker; (2) to obstruct or interfere with an election worker; or (3) that injure an election worker. Permits the use of an electronic device at a precinct or vote center to display a sample ballot. Provides, beginning January 1, 2024, that in a county that is not designated as a vote center county, a local public question or referendum may be placed on the ballot only at the following elections: (1) A general election. (2) A municipal general election, but only if the election district for the public question is contained entirely within a municipality. Provides, beginning January 1, 2024, that: (1) a state public question; or (2) an election of delegates to a convention to consider ratifying an amendment to the United States Constitution; may be placed on the ballot only at a general election. Specifies a temporary exception to the provisions concerning local public questions. Makes certain changes to the public question ballot language required for a controlled project referendum, school operations fund referendum, and school safety referendum. Declares confidential particular information that directly or indirectly indicates the selections made by a voter while voting in an election. Authorizes the repurposing of an electronic poll book unit as a device to display sample ballots if the electronic poll book software is deleted from the unit. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Various elections matters.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] | Rep. Robert Cherry [R] |
Rep. Tonya Pfaff [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Cherry and Pfaff |
2023-02-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Wesco |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 168: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Walker G) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as second author |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2023-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Walker G |
Subjects
CRIMES AND OFFENSES, Offenses Against Persons
ELECTIONS, Voters and Voting; Registration
LOCAL GOVERNMENT
PUBLIC QUESTIONS
ELECTIONS, Voters and Voting; Registration
LOCAL GOVERNMENT
PUBLIC QUESTIONS