IN SB0224 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prekindergarten status report. Requires the department of education (department), in consultation with the family and social services administration, to conduct a survey to determine the number of children who were four years of age and enrolled in a prekindergarten program during the 2015-2016 school year. Requires, not later than December 1, 2017, the department to submit a report concerning the survey to the general assembly.
Title
Prekindergarten status report. Requires the department of education (department), in consultation with the family and social services administration, to conduct a survey to determine the number of children who were four years of age and enrolled in a prekindergarten program during the 2015-2016 school year. Requires, not later than December 1, 2017, the department to submit a report concerning the survey to the general assembly.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Charles Burton [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Thompson |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Burton |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 150: yeas 41, nays 5 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Senators Becker and Glick added as coauthors |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |