IN SB0224 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 182
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 182
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Duties of Article V convention delegates.
Title
Duties of Article V convention delegates.
Sponsors
Sen. David Long [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 182 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 498: yeas 37, nays 11 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Motion to concur in House amendments filed |
2013-04-15 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-04-15 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 486: yeas 64, nays 28 |
2013-04-11 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-04-04 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as cosponsor |
2013-03-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Bosma |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 211: yeas 39 and nays 11 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Long |