IN SB0223 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Venture capital investment tax credit. Adds veteran owned businesses (in addition to minority business enterprises and women's business enterprises) to a provision specifying the computation of the maximum amount of tax credits available for the provision of qualified investment capital to those businesses. Provides that if the total amount of tax credits that may be awarded by the Indiana economic development corporation (IEDC) exceeds the $20,000,000 maximum for a particular calendar year, the IEDC may borrow credits from the subsequent calendar year to facilitate investment of qualified investment capital to a qualified Indiana business or to a qualified Indiana investment fund at the end of a particular calendar year. Specifies that the borrowing of credits from a subsequent calendar year reduces the amount of credits available for the subsequent calendar year in an amount equal to the amount of credits borrowed in the preceding calendar year. Provides that the IEDC may borrow not more than 50% of the credits from a subsequent calendar year. Requires the department of state revenue (department) to annually determine the total amount of credits that were borrowed from each applicable calendar year and post the determined amount on the department's Internet web site.
Title
Venture capital investment tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second author |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Jeter C |
2022-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Torr |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 55: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senator Walker K removed as second author |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Senator Walker K added as second author |
2022-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Baldwin |