IN SB0223 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a local health officer to show identification and receive consent before entering a premises to inspect or perform other tasks to determine compliance with public health laws and rules and to prevent and suppress disease. Sets forth circumstances in which consent is not required. Sets forth multiple actions that a court may take to enforce a local board of health order, citation, or administrative notice. (Current law allows the court to enforce an order by injunction.) Specifies that the entries into the Indiana death registration system are required only for deaths that occurred after December 31, 2010. Allows the state department of health (department) to adopt rules concerning who may input and retrieve data from the immunization data registry (registry). Allows an individual to file a registry exemption with the department. Allows the release of registry information to specified persons without the consent of the person. Removes language that requires the department to convene a panel concerning expanding access to the registry. Removes a requirement that a health care professional work at least one year in a shortage area or at other specified health centers in order to be eligible for the loan repayment program. Requires that the health care professional agree to practice in the shortage area for at least one year. Allows the Indiana health care professional recruitment and retention fund to be used to encourage delivery of health care in shortage areas on a full-time or less than full-time basis.
Title
Department of health matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-14 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 347: yeas 44, nays 0 | |
2012-03-09 | Senate Rule 86(a) suspended | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 399: yeas 96, nays 1 | |
2012-03-09 | Rules suspended | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2012-03-01 | House advisors appointed: Friend, Bacon and Day | |
2012-03-01 | House conferees appointed: T. Brown and C. Fry | |
2012-02-29 | Senate advisor appointed: Becker and Rogers | |
2012-02-29 | Senate conferee appointed: Miller and Breaux | |
2012-02-29 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 296: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 1 (T. Brown), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2012-01-31 | House sponsor: Rep. T. Brown | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 123: yeas 50, nays 0 | |
2012-01-30 | Amendment 3 (Miller), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-30 | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Third reading: placed back on second reading | |
2012-01-23 | Amendment 2 (Simpson), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-23 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-19 | Senator Breaux added as coauthor | |
2012-01-12 | Senator Becker added as second author | |
2012-01-12 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Miller |